NM HM58 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cal Ripken, Sr. Foundation
Title
Cal Ripken, Sr. Foundation
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | Senate | Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature) |
2023-03-12 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:63 N:1 |
2023-02-25 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2023-02-20 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC |