NM HJM20 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-13 - [LD 20] Passed Senate (31-0) Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-13 - [LD 20] Passed Senate (31-0) Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Bernalillo case management pilot project
Title
Bernalillo case management pilot project
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Miera [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | [LD 20] Passed Senate (31-0) Signed by one or both houses. | |
2012-02-08 | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Rules | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-02-06 | [LD 15] Passed House (66-0) | |
2012-02-03 | [LD 14] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-03 | [LD 14] Do not pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-26 | [LD 8] Referred to House Health & Government Affairs |