NM HB71 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
City acquisition of abandoned cemeteries
Title
City acquisition of abandoned cemeteries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] DP API. | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] DP-SJC | |
2011-02-11 | [LD 25] SPAC/SJC-SPAC | |
2011-02-17 | [LD 31] PASSED/H (64-2) | |
2011-02-14 | [LD 28] DP | |
2011-02-04 | [LD 18] DP-HHGAC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] HCPAC/HHGAC-HCPAC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] HPREF |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=71&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/house/HB0071.pdf |