NM HB459 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Passed Senate (38-1) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Beef Council Assessment Opt-out

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Beef Council Assessment Opt-out

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-19Senate[LD 34] Passed Senate (38-1) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
2017-02-17Senate[LD 32] Do pass committee report adopted
2017-02-13Senate[LD 28] Referred to Senate Conservation
2017-02-13Senate[LD 28] Referred to Senate Conservation
2017-01-28House[LD 12] Passed House (64-0)
2017-01-26House[LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted
2017-01-23House[LD 7] HSIVC
2017-01-23House[LD 7] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted
2017-01-23House[LD 7] Do not pass committee report adopted
2017-01-22House[LD 6] Referred to House Agriculture, Water & Wildlife
2017-01-22House[LD 6] Assigned to House Agriculture, Water & Wildlife and then to HSIVC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback