NM HB431 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] h and then to cncrd SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.157.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] h and then to cncrd SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.157.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mounted patrol concealed firearms fees
Title
Mounted patrol concealed firearms fees
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Wooley [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] h and then to cncrd SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.157. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Passed Senate (31-5) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Floor amendment adopted |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] Passed House (59-0) |
2015-02-09 | House | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-02 | House | [LD 10] Referred to House Judiciary |