NM HB360 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 258 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 258 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Educational Retirement Changes
Title
Educational Retirement Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 258 - Apr. 4 |
2019-03-15 | House | House has concurred with Senate Amendments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:32 N:2 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2019-03-08 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:59 N:7 |
2019-03-06 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-02-06 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-24 | House | Sent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC/HAFC |