NM HB358 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] DP - PASSED/S (34-0) SGND (Apr. 5) Ch. 72.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] DP - PASSED/S (34-0) SGND (Apr. 5) Ch. 72.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Conservancy district elections requirements
Title
Conservancy district elections requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Roch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] DP - PASSED/S (34-0) SGND (Apr. 5) Ch. 72. | |
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] DP-SJC | |
2011-02-11 | [LD 25] SRC/SJC-SRC | |
2011-02-18 | [LD 32] PASSED/H (68-0) | |
2011-02-14 | [LD 28] DP | |
2011-02-05 | [LD 19] DP/a-HJC | |
2011-01-30 | [LD 13] HVEC/HJC-HVEC |