NM HB302 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-15 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-15 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child Sexual Abuse Statute Of Limitations
Title
Child Sexual Abuse Statute Of Limitations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-15 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2020-02-15 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC |
2020-02-14 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:61 N:4 |
2020-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2020-02-11 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-05 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-30 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HJC |