NM HB27 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-18 - LAW WITHOUT SIGNATURE.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-18 - LAW WITHOUT SIGNATURE.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Breast Exam Health Coverage
Title
Breast Exam Health Coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-02-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-18 | House | LAW WITHOUT SIGNATURE. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:35 N:0 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC |
2023-02-25 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:58 N:0 |
2023-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2023-02-23 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2023-01-24 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2023-01-18 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HJC |
2023-01-17 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |