NM HB27 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-13 - SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-13 - SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create Crime Of Hazing
Title
Create Crime Of Hazing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-13 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Sent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC/SJC |
2021-02-28 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:60 N:9 |
2021-02-22 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2021-02-16 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2021-01-28 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HJC/HAFC |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |