NM HB27 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 19] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 19] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change Parole To Supervised Release
Title
Change Parole To Supervised Release
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Action postponed indefinitely |
2018-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-02-12 | House | [LD 8] Passed House (34-41) |
2018-02-12 | House | [LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-26 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-01-26 | House | [LD 3] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Consumer & Public Affairs and then to House Judiciary |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Printed |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] Not Printed |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |