NM HB258 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 31 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - [LD 51] Passed Senate (39-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 31 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - [LD 51] Passed Senate (39-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health counselor freedom of choice
Title
Mental health counselor freedom of choice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | [LD 51] Passed Senate (39-0) Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-03-12 | House | [LD 38] Passed House (65-0) |
2015-03-09 | House | [LD 35] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] HHC |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-23 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs |
2015-01-23 | House | [LD 4] Assigned to House Regulatory & Public Affairs and then to HHC |