NM HB254 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 64 - Mar. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 64 - Mar. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Distributions To School Districts
Title
Distributions To School Districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 64 - Mar. 6 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2020-02-15 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2020-02-15 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:66 N:0 |
2020-02-13 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-11 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-01-27 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HAFC |