NM HB25 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Teaching Pathways Coordinator
Title
Teaching Pathways Coordinator
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Bash [D] | Rep. Natalie Figueroa [D] | Rep. Joy Garratt [D] | Rep. Andres Romero [D] |
Rep. Christine Trujillo [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-13 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC |
2019-03-06 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:63 N:2 |
2019-03-05 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-20 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-13 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HAFC |