NM HB25 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-07 - [LD 20] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-07 - [LD 20] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mobility Limitation Transport Car Placards
Title
Mobility Limitation Transport Car Placards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-07 | Senate | [LD 20] Action postponed indefinitely |
2016-02-07 | Senate | [LD 20] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-25 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2016-01-25 | Senate | [LD 7] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Public Affairs |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Passed House (64-0) |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Printed |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Not Printed |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |