NM HB241 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 127 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 127 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Project Revolving Fund Projects
Title
Public Project Revolving Fund Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 127 - Apr. 2 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:65 N:0 |
2019-02-26 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-01-17 | House | Sent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC |