NM HB222 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 12 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - [LD 17] Passed Senate (39-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 8) Ch. 45.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 12 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - [LD 17] Passed Senate (39-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 8) Ch. 45.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pueblo lease of adjudicated water
Title
Pueblo lease of adjudicated water
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Passed Senate (39-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 8) Ch. 45. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (64-0) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-31 | House | [LD 9] Referred to House Agriculture & Water Resources |
2014-01-31 | House | [LD 9] Assigned to House Agriculture & Water Resources and then to House Judiciary |
2014-01-31 | House | [LD 9] Printed |
2014-01-31 | House | [LD 9] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-01-28 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2014-01-28 | House | [LD 6] Not Printed |