NM HB187 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 20] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 43
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 20] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 43
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extend Certain Multi-term Contract Terms
Title
Extend Certain Multi-term Contract Terms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | [LD 20] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 43 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | [LD 20] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-02-10 | House | [LD 7] Passed House (64-0) |
2018-02-10 | House | [LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-08 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-02-08 | House | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-30 | House | [LD 3] HSIVC |
2018-01-30 | House | [LD 3] Assigned to HSIVC and then to House Judiciary |
2018-01-30 | House | [LD 3] Printed |
2018-01-30 | House | [LD 3] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-30 | House | [LD 3] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-01-24 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2018-01-24 | House | [LD 2] Not Printed |