NM HB172 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] PASSED/S (22-17) SGND (Apr. 6) Ch. 97.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] PASSED/S (22-17) SGND (Apr. 6) Ch. 97.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
No corporal punishment as school discipline
Title
No corporal punishment as school discipline
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Miera [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] PASSED/S (22-17) SGND (Apr. 6) Ch. 97. | |
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] DP | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] SEC | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] PASSED/H (36-31) | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] DP | |
2011-02-07 | [LD 21] DP/a-HEC | |
2011-01-21 | [LD 4] HCPAC/HEC-HCPAC |