NM HB158 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SJC
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SJC
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Legislatively Created Task Force Open Mtgs.
Title
Legislatively Created Task Force Open Mtgs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SJC |
2021-02-22 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0 |
2021-02-16 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-04 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-25 | House | Sent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC/HJC |