NM HB137 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - [LD 28] Passed Senate (34-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - [LD 28] Passed Senate (34-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
County Subdivision Records Filing
Title
County Subdivision Records Filing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Senate | [LD 28] Passed Senate (34-0) Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2017-02-12 | Senate | [LD 27] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-10 | Senate | [LD 25] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-02-10 | Senate | [LD 25] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-03 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-02-03 | Senate | [LD 18] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-24 | House | [LD 8] Passed House (67-0) |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | [LD 1] HSIVC |
2017-01-17 | House | [LD 1] HSIVC and then to House Judiciary |