NM HB111 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-02 - [LD 13] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-02 - [LD 13] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Public corruption offenses
Title
Public corruption offenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Action postponed indefinitely | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Public Affairs | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance | |
2012-02-03 | [LD 14] Passed House (41-26) | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Do not pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Referred to House Judiciary | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Assigned to House Judiciary | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] re | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action h and then to calendar | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted | |
2012-01-25 | [LD 7] Referred to House Judiciary | |
2012-01-25 | [LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Referred to House Health & Government Affairs | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Assigned to House Health & Government Affairs and then to House Judiciary |