NJ SR111 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges United States Congress to dedicate additional federal funds for highway maintenance and infrastructure improvements in New Jersey.
Title
Urges United States Congress to dedicate additional federal funds for highway maintenance and infrastructure improvements in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Sen. James Holzapfel [R] | Sen. Nicholas Sacco [D] | Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] | Sen. Robert Gordon [D] |
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (Voice) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR50 (Same As) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/SR111 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/SR/111_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SR111 |