NJ SJR82 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Approved P.L.2021, JR-1.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Approved P.L.2021, JR-1.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates March 9 of each year "COVID-19 Heroes Day" in New Jersey.
Title
Designates March 9 of each year "COVID-19 Heroes Day" in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR166 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR166 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, JR-1. |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-0-0) |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Substituted for AJR166 |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR166 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Substituted by SJR82