NJ SJR66 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR126
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR226
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR226
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - Substituted by AJR86
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - Substituted by AJR86
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designating fourth Wednesday in May of each year as "Crisis Professionals Day."
Title
Designating fourth Wednesday in May of each year as "Crisis Professionals Day."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-20 | Senate | Substituted by AJR86 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR126 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Passed by the Senate (36-0)
AJR226 (Carry Over) 2023-05-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
AJR86 (Same As) 2024-05-22 - Approved P.L.2024, JR-1.
AJR226 (Carry Over) 2023-05-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
AJR86 (Same As) 2024-05-22 - Approved P.L.2024, JR-1.