NJ SJR42 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Substituted by AJR57
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Substituted by AJR57
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates April of each year as "Sarcoidosis Awareness Month."
Title
Designates April of each year as "Sarcoidosis Awareness Month."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-10-19 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Senate | Substituted by AJR57 |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR57 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, JR-10.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/SJR42 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/SJR/42_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SJR42 |