NJ S885 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2981
Note: Carry Over of previous S2981
Note: Carry Over of previous S2981
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-26 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Pending: Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-26 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Pending: Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires maximum contaminant level to be established for 1,2,3-trichloropropane in drinking water.
Title
Requires maximum contaminant level to be established for 1,2,3-trichloropropane in drinking water.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-26 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (29-6) |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2981 (Carry Over) 2015-06-29 - Substituted by A3954 (1R)
S2981 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2981 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/S885 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/S1000/885_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S885 |