NJ S879 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3633
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - Approved P.L.2018, c.61.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - Approved P.L.2018, c.61.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends definition of "existing major hazardous waste facility" in "Major Hazardous Waste Facilities Siting Act."
Title
Amends definition of "existing major hazardous waste facility" in "Major Hazardous Waste Facilities Siting Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3116 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3116 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-03 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.61. |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0) |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-06-07 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (37-0) |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-4-0) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Substituted for A3116 |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3633 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
A3116 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S879
A3116 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S879