NJ A3116 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3633
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S879
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S879
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends definition of "existing major hazardous waste facility" in "Major Hazardous Waste Facilities Siting Act."
Title
Amends definition of "existing major hazardous waste facility" in "Major Hazardous Waste Facilities Siting Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Substituted by S879 |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S879 (Same As) 2018-07-03 - Approved P.L.2018, c.61.
S3633 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S3633 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee