NJ S870 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2624

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on October 29 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-10-29 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Dual Enrollment Study Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Dual Enrollment Study Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3636 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-29SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
2018-10-29SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2018-10-29AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
2018-10-29AssemblySubstituted for A3636 (1R)
2018-05-07AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-05-07AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
2018-02-01AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
2018-02-01SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading

Same As/Similar To

S2624 (Carry Over) 2016-12-19 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3636 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S870 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback