NJ S748 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-18 - Approved P.L.2011, c.105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-18 - Approved P.L.2011, c.105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $3.567 million from Clean Waters bond fund for sewerage infrastructure improvements at former Marlboro Psychiatric Hospital. *
Title
Appropriates $3.567 million from Clean Waters bond fund for sewerage infrastructure improvements at former Marlboro Psychiatric Hospital. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-18 | Approved P.L.2011, c.105 | |
2011-06-29 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) | |
2011-06-29 | Substituted for A4169 | |
2011-03-07 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-06 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee | |
2010-12-20 | Passed by the Senate (37-0) | |
2010-12-06 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-03 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2010-06-03 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1832 (Same As) 2011-03-07 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee