NJ S647 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1972
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Approved P.L.2018, c.72.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Approved P.L.2018, c.72.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits registered voters to receive mail-in ballots automatically for all elections under certain conditions.
Title
Permits registered voters to receive mail-in ballots automatically for all elections under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1186 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.72. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-22-0) |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted for A1186 (ACS) |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (23-14) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Motion To Table Sa (23-14) (Weinberg) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Motion To Sa (Thompson) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1972 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1186 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Substituted by S647 (SCS/1R)
A1186 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Substituted by S647 (SCS/1R)