NJ S1972 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S647
Note: Carry Over of previous S2392
Note: Carry Over of previous S2392
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-23 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-23 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits registered voters to receive mail-in ballots automatically for all elections under certain conditions.
Title
Permits registered voters to receive mail-in ballots automatically for all elections under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1972 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2392 (Carry Over) 2015-05-14 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A3679 (Same As) 2016-04-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S2392 (Carry Over) 2015-05-14 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A3679 (Same As) 2016-04-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee