NJ S537 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2173
Note: Carry Over of previous S794
Note: Carry Over of previous A2942
Note: Carry Over of previous S794
Note: Carry Over of previous A2942
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.260.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.260.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes certain minimum and maximum temperatures in rooming and boarding houses, dementia care homes, and certain nursing homes and residential health care facilities.
Title
Establishes certain minimum and maximum temperatures in rooming and boarding houses, dementia care homes, and certain nursing homes and residential health care facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Codey [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3110 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3110 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.260. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A3110 (1R) |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S537 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.260.
S794 (Carry Over) 2018-05-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3110 (Same As) 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S537 (1R)
A2942 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S794 (Carry Over) 2018-05-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3110 (Same As) 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S537 (1R)
A2942 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee