NJ A3110 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2942
Note: Carry Over of previous S794
Note: Carry Over of previous S794
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S537 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S537 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes certain minimum and maximum temperatures in rooming and boarding houses, dementia care homes, and certain nursing homes and residential health care facilities.
Title
Establishes certain minimum and maximum temperatures in rooming and boarding houses, dementia care homes, and certain nursing homes and residential health care facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Pedro Mejia [D] |
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S537 (1R) |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S537 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.260.
A2942 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S794 (Carry Over) 2018-05-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2942 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S794 (Carry Over) 2018-05-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee