NJ S4222 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A6207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A6207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates requirement for DOE to set certain tuition rates for approved private schools for students with disabilities in certain cases.
Title
Eliminates requirement for DOE to set certain tuition rates for approved private schools for students with disabilities in certain cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted by A6207 |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A6207 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.487.