NJ S4210 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.424.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.424.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires EDA to establish loan program to assist certain businesses with funding to provide reasonable accommodations for employees with disabilities.
Title
Requires EDA to establish loan program to assist certain businesses with funding to provide reasonable accommodations for employees with disabilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A6062 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A6062 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.424. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted for A6062 (1R) |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A6062 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S4210 (1R)