NJ S3995 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.200.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.200.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes School and Small Business Energy Efficiency Stimulus Program Fund in BPU.
Title
Establishes School and Small Business Energy Efficiency Stimulus Program Fund in BPU.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] |
Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5944 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5944 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-24 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.200. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-2-0) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A5944 |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-2) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5944 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S3995