NJ S347 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2697
Note: Carry Over of previous S4256
Note: Carry Over of previous S3329
Note: Carry Over of previous S4256
Note: Carry Over of previous S3329
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates presumption of non-imprisonment for theft of a firearm.
Title
Eliminates presumption of non-imprisonment for theft of a firearm.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S347 (Carry Over) 2022-03-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S4256 (Carry Over) 2021-12-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A4737 (Same As) 2022-10-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S3329 (Carry Over) 2021-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S4256 (Carry Over) 2021-12-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A4737 (Same As) 2022-10-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S3329 (Carry Over) 2021-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee