NJ S3328 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-07 - Approved P.L.2023, c.104.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-07 - Approved P.L.2023, c.104.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allows issuance of alcoholic beverage retail license for use in connection with nonprofit movie theaters that promote arts.
Title
Allows issuance of alcoholic beverage retail license for use in connection with nonprofit movie theaters that promote arts.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4873 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4873 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-07 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2023, c.104. |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Substituted for A4873 |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-11-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4873 (Same As) 2023-06-30 - Substituted by S3328