NJ A4873 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-30 - Substituted by S3328
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-30 - Substituted by S3328
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows issuance of alcoholic beverage retail license for use in connection with nonprofit movie theaters that promote arts.
Title
Allows issuance of alcoholic beverage retail license for use in connection with nonprofit movie theaters that promote arts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Substituted by S3328 |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2022-11-21 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3328 (Same As) 2023-07-07 - Approved P.L.2023, c.104.