PA HB1820 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 3, 1933 (P.L.242, No.86), referred to as the Cosmetology Law, further providing for definitions, for practice without license prohibited, for eligibility requirements for examination, for limited licenses, for requirements of a school of cosmetology, for practice in licensed salons only, for booth rental prohibited, for fees, for applicability, for duration and renewal of licenses and for penalties.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for practice without license prohibited, for eligibility requirements for examination, for limited licenses, for requirements of a school of cosmetology, for practice in licensed salons only, for booth rental prohibited, for fees, for applicability, for duration and renewal of licenses and for penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1820 PN 2446, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1820 PN 2256, 2023 A3298 (Y: 106 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1820 PN 2256, 2023 A3109 (Y: 101 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1820 PN 2256, 2023 A3108 (Y: 101 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1820 PN 2256, 2023 A3104 (Y: 101 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1820 PN 2256, 2023 A3107 (Y: 101 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-11-15 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1820 PN 2446, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1820 PN 2256, 2023 A3298 (Y: 106 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1820 PN 2256, 2023 A3109 (Y: 101 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1820 PN 2256, 2023 A3108 (Y: 101 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1820 PN 2256, 2023 A3104 (Y: 101 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1820 PN 2256, 2023 A3107 (Y: 101 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-11-15 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2024-07-02 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-07-02 | Senate | Second consideration |
2024-07-01 | Senate | First consideration |
2024-07-01 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2024-03-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2024-03-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2024-03-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-12-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-12-13 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2023-12-12 | House | Removed from table |
2023-11-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-11-15 | House | First consideration |
2023-11-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-11-08 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |