NJ S3246 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.320.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes elective pass-through entity business alternative income tax and allows corresponding refundable gross income tax and corporation business tax credit.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes elective pass-through entity business alternative income tax and allows corresponding refundable gross income tax and corporation business tax credit.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4807 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.320.
2019-12-16SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0)
2019-12-16SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-12-16AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
2019-12-16AssemblySubstituted for A4807 (2R)
2019-12-12AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-12-12AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-03-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-01-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-12-17SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2018-12-10SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-12-03SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4807 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3246 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback