NJ S3241 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on December 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-22 - Approved P.L.2022, c.132.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on December 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-22 - Approved P.L.2022, c.132.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Extends temporary waiver of certain basic life support services and specialty care transport unit crewmember requirements.
Title
Extends temporary waiver of certain basic life support services and specialty care transport unit crewmember requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Sen. Edward Durr [R] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] | Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4918 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-31 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4918 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-31 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-22 | Senate | Approved P.L.2022, c.132. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2022-12-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2022-12-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2022-12-15 | Assembly | Substituted for A4918 (1R) |
2022-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-12-12 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-11-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
2022-11-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2022-10-31 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-10-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4918 (Same As) 2022-12-15 - Substituted by S3241 (1R)