NJ A4918 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by S3214
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-15 - Substituted by S3241 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-15 - Substituted by S3241 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends temporary waiver of certain basic life support services and specialty care transport unit crewmember requirements.
Title
Extends temporary waiver of certain basic life support services and specialty care transport unit crewmember requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] |
Rep. Kevin Rooney [R] | Rep. Kim Eulner [R] | Rep. Marilyn Piperno [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-15 | Assembly | Substituted by S3241 (1R) |
2022-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-12-12 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-12-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3241 (Same As) 2022-12-22 - Approved P.L.2022, c.132.
S3214 (Replaced by) 2022-12-19 - Substituted by A4769 (ACS)
S3214 (Replaced by) 2022-12-19 - Substituted by A4769 (ACS)