NJ S3214 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-19 - Substituted by A4769 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Makes various revisions to requirements for obtaining a firearm purchaser identification card, permit to purchase a handgun, and permit to carry a handgun; codifies sensitive places in which firearms and destructive devices are prohibited.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various revisions to requirements for obtaining a firearm purchaser identification card, permit to purchase a handgun, and permit to carry a handgun; codifies sensitive places in which firearms and destructive devices are prohibited.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-27 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-12-19SenateSubstituted by A4769 (ACS)
2022-12-05SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2022-10-27SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2022-10-27SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2022-10-17SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4769 (Same As) 2022-12-22 - Approved P.L.2022, c.131.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback