NJ S3172 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1663
Note: Carry Foward to future S2028
Note: Carry Foward to future S2028
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes teacher certification route for candidates with Montessori teaching credentials.
Title
Establishes teacher certification route for candidates with Montessori teaching credentials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4689 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-04 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-27 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4689 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-04 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-27 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-16 | Senate | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2024-01-08 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2024-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted for A4689 (1R) |
2024-01-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-04 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2023-12-11 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz) |
2022-10-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-10-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3172 (Carry Over) 2024-01-16 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S3172 (Carry Over) 2024-01-16 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A4689 (Same As) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by S3172 (2R)
S3172 (Carry Over) 2024-01-16 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A4689 (Same As) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by S3172 (2R)