NJ S3074 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2686
Note: Carry Over of previous A2686
Note: Carry Over of previous A2686
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.201.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.201.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes gubernatorial veto power over Waterfront Commission of New York Harbor's meeting minutes; expands gubernatorial oversight powers over commission.
Title
Establishes gubernatorial veto power over Waterfront Commission of New York Harbor's meeting minutes; expands gubernatorial oversight powers over commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Raymond Lesniak [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Sheila Oliver [D] |
Rep. Jamel Holley [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] | Sen. Ronald Rice [D] | Rep. Amy Handlin [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4586 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-07 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.201. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Substituted for A4586 (1R) |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4586 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S3074
A2686 (Carry Over) 2014-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A2686 (Carry Over) 2016-12-05 - Withdrawn from Consideration
A2686 (Carry Over) 2014-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A2686 (Carry Over) 2016-12-05 - Withdrawn from Consideration