NJ S2968 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A2758

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.111.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Permits certain health care professionals to waive health insurance copayments for members of military on active duty and their family members. *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits certain health care professionals to waive health insurance copayments for members of military on active duty and their family members. *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2550 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.111.
2019-03-25AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0)
2019-03-25AssemblySubstituted for A2550 (2R)
2019-02-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-02-21SenatePassed by the Senate (35-0)
2018-12-17SenateSenate Amendment (38-0) (Singleton)
2018-12-06SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-09-24SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2550 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S2968 (2R)
A2758 (Carry Over) 2017-06-12 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback