NJ A2550 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A2758

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits certain health care professionals to waive health insurance copayments for members of military serving on active duty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits certain health care professionals to waive health insurance copayments for members of military serving on active duty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-01AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2758 (Carry Over) 2017-06-12 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2968 (Same As) 2018-12-06 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback